+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (35)
On March 31, 1995 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0612)
On March 25, 1995 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 612 (effective 7/1/95)
On March 10, 1995 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 8, 1995 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 7, 1995 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On March 2, 1995 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB897ER)
On February 23, 1995 in the Senate:
- Reading of substitute waived
- House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT (40-Y 0-N)
On February 21, 1995 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Passed House with substitute (Block Vote) (100-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House - com. sub. LD2297124-H1
- Committee substitute agreed to LD2297124-H1
- Read third time
On February 20, 1995 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 17, 1995 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed LD2297124-H1
- Reported from Appropriations with sub. (21-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 1995 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Read first time
On February 3, 1995 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 2, 1995 in the Senate:
- Printed as engrossed LD3187753-E
- Read second time
- Reading of amendment waived
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to House
On February 1, 1995 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On January 31, 1995 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance with amendment (15-Y 0-N)
On January 23, 1995 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Presented & ordered printed LD3187753
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (7)
February 23, 1995: VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT (40-Y 0-N)
February 21, 1995: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 17, 1995: Reported from Appropriations with sub. (21-Y 0-N)
February 2, 1995: VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
February 2, 1995: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
February 1, 1995: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
January 31, 1995: Reported from Finance with amendment (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor