+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (34)
On March 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 751 (effective 7/1/17)
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0751)
On February 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017
On February 21, 2017 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/21/17
On February 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 20, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB897ER)
- Enrolled
On February 15, 2017 in the House:
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read third time
On February 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- House amendments agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N)
On February 15, 2017 in the House:
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Passed House with amendments (77-Y 22-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (77-Y 22-N)
On February 14, 2017 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 13, 2017 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations (20-Y 1-N)
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendments (16-Y 6-N)
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Assigned App. sub: Health & Human Resources
On February 2, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On January 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 2-N)
On January 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB897S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 17104091D-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read second time
On January 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On January 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (14-Y 0-N)
On January 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Finance
- Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (13-Y 2-N)
- Committee substitute printed 17104091D-S1
On December 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17100203D