+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On March 11, 1999 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0060)
On March 9, 1999 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 60 (effective 7/1/99)
On February 19, 1999 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 18, 1999 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 17, 1999 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On February 15, 1999 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB897ER)
On February 15, 1999 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Passed House (Block Vote) (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 12, 1999 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 11, 1999 in the House:
- Reported from Corp., Ins. & Banking (26-Y 0-N)
On January 22, 1999 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Referred to Committee on Corporations, Insurance and Banking
- Read first time
On January 21, 1999 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (38-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
On January 20, 1999 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 19, 1999 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On January 18, 1999 in the Senate:
- Reported from Commerce and Labor (14-Y 0-N)
On January 14, 1999 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Presented & ordered printed 993323845
+ − Votes (5)
February 15, 1999: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 11, 1999: Reported from Corp., Ins. & Banking (26-Y 0-N)
January 21, 1999: VOTE: PASSAGE R (38-Y 0-N)
January 19, 1999: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
January 18, 1999: Reported from Commerce and Labor (14-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor