+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (33)
On March 26, 2023 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 608 (effective 7/1/23)
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0608)
On March 2, 2023 in the Senate:
- Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 27, 2023
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 2, 2023
On February 25, 2023 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 23, 2023 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 23, 2023 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB896ER)
- Enrolled
On February 20, 2023 in the Senate:
- House substitute agreed to by Senate (21-Y 19-N)
- Reconsideration of House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Title replaced 23106688D-H1
- House substitute agreed to by Senate (34-Y 6-N)
On February 16, 2023 in the House:
- Committee substitute agreed to 23106688D-H1
- Read third time
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB896H1
- VOTE: Passage (52-Y 47-N)
- Passed House with substitute (52-Y 47-N)
On February 15, 2023 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 13, 2023 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 23106688D-H1
- Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (11-Y 8-N)
On February 10, 2023 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 7, 2023 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (32-Y 8-N)
- Passed Senate (26-Y 14-N)
- Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 2023 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 3, 2023 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On February 2, 2023 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N)
On January 30, 2023 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations
- Reported from Judiciary (8-Y 7-N)
On January 5, 2023 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on the Judiciary
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23103447D
+ − Impact Statements (6)
+ − Votes (11)
February 20, 2023: House substitute agreed to by Senate (34-Y 6-N)
February 20, 2023: House substitute agreed to by Senate (21-Y 19-N)
February 20, 2023: Reconsideration of House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 16, 2023: VOTE: Passage (52-Y 47-N)
February 13, 2023: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (11-Y 8-N)
February 7, 2023: Read third time and passed Senate (32-Y 8-N)
February 7, 2023: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 7, 2023: Passed Senate (26-Y 14-N)
February 3, 2023: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
February 2, 2023: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N)
January 30, 2023: Reported from Judiciary (8-Y 7-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor