+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (25)
On April 2, 1999 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0483)
On March 27, 1999 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 483 (effective 7/1/99)
On March 3, 1999 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 1, 1999 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 1, 1999 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On February 26, 1999 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB895ER)
On February 18, 1999 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N 1-A)
- Passed House (98-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 17, 1999 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 16, 1999 in the House:
- Reported from Corp., Ins. & Banking (25-Y 0-N)
On February 11, 1999 in the House:
- Reported from H. W. I. (20-Y 0-N)
- Referred to Committee on Corporations, Insurance and Banking
On January 22, 1999 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On January 21, 1999 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (38-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
On January 20, 1999 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 19, 1999 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On January 18, 1999 in the Senate:
- Reported from Commerce and Labor (14-Y 0-N)
On January 14, 1999 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Presented & ordered printed 993334845
+ − Votes (6)
February 18, 1999: VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N 1-A)
February 16, 1999: Reported from Corp., Ins. & Banking (25-Y 0-N)
February 11, 1999: Reported from H. W. I. (20-Y 0-N)
January 21, 1999: VOTE: PASSAGE R (38-Y 0-N)
January 19, 1999: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
January 18, 1999: Reported from Commerce and Labor (14-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor