+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On March 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0381)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 381 (effective 7/1/20)
On March 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020
On March 7, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 6, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB894ER)
- Enrolled
On February 28, 2020 in the House:
- VOTE: Passage (64-Y 35-N)
- Passed House (64-Y 35-N)
- Read third time
On February 27, 2020 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 25, 2020 in the House:
- Reported from Labor and Commerce (19-Y 3-N)
On February 18, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Labor and Commerce
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (21-Y 19-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported from Commerce and Labor (12-Y 3-N)
On January 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20105117D
+ − Impact Statements (2)
+ − Votes (6)
February 28, 2020: VOTE: Passage (64-Y 35-N)
February 25, 2020: Reported from Labor and Commerce (19-Y 3-N)
February 11, 2020: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 11, 2020: Passed Senate (21-Y 19-N)
February 10, 2020: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
February 9, 2020: Reported from Commerce and Labor (12-Y 3-N)
+ − Sponsor
Richard L. Saslaw
Type:
Primary Sponsor