+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (31)
On April 4, 2005 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0737)
On March 26, 2005 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 737 (effective 7/1/05)
On March 4, 2005 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 3, 2005 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 2, 2005 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB893ER)
On February 17, 2005 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT (40-Y 0-N)
- House amendments agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 15, 2005 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
- Passed House with amendments BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read third time
On February 14, 2005 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 10, 2005 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws with amds (22-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 2005 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Read first time
On February 7, 2005 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 2005 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB893S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 053320736-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read second time
On February 3, 2005 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 2, 2005 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 053320736-S1
On February 1, 2005 in the Senate:
- Reported from Local Government w/sub (15-Y 0-N)
On January 11, 2005 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Local Government
- Prefiled & ordered printed; offered 01/12/05 052717104
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (6)
February 17, 2005: VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT (40-Y 0-N)
February 15, 2005: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
February 10, 2005: Reported from General Laws with amds (22-Y 0-N)
February 7, 2005: VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
February 3, 2005: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
February 1, 2005: Reported from Local Government w/sub (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor