+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (24)
On February 17, 1997 in the House:
- No action taken by General Laws by voice vote
On February 5, 1997 in the House:
- Assigned to General Laws sub-committee: 6
On February 4, 1997 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Read first time
On February 3, 1997 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On January 31, 1997 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Reading of amendment waived
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
- Rec. of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: RECONSIDER (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to House
- Printed as engrossed 974676428-E
On January 30, 1997 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On January 29, 1997 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws with amd. (15-Y 0-N)
On January 15, 1997 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Presented & ordered printed 974676428
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
January 31, 1997: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
January 31, 1997: VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
January 31, 1997: VOTE: RECONSIDER (40-Y 0-N)
January 31, 1997: VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
January 30, 1997: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
January 29, 1997: Reported from General Laws with amd. (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor