+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (29)
On March 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 528 (effective 7/1/13)
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0528)
On February 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 19, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB890ER)
On February 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Title replaced 13105031D-H1
On February 12, 2013 in the House:
- Read third time
- Committee substitute agreed to 13105031D-H1
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB890H1
- Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
On February 11, 2013 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 8, 2013 in the House:
- Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 13105031D-H1
On January 25, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
On January 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On January 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Reading of amendment waived
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate as amended SB890E
- Printed as engrossed 13102693D-E
On January 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On January 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported from Local Government with amendment (14-Y 0-N)
On January 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13102693D
- Referred to Committee on Local Government
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
February 14, 2013: House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 12, 2013: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 8, 2013: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
January 21, 2013: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
January 17, 2013: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
January 15, 2013: Reported from Local Government with amendment (14-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor