+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (41)
On April 17, 1998 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0390)
On April 12, 1998 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 390 (effective 7/1/98)
On April 8, 1998 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 6, 1998 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On April 6, 1998 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On April 1, 1998 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB89ER)
On March 12, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reading of amendment waived
- House amendment agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT R (39-Y 0-N)
On March 11, 1998 in the House:
- Read third time
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Motion for pending question agreed to
- Pending question ordered
- Passed House with amendment (76-Y 24-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (76-Y 24-N)
On March 10, 1998 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On March 9, 1998 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On March 6, 1998 in the House:
- Read second time
On March 5, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations with amd. (25-Y 0-N)
On February 25, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from Claims with amendment (10-Y 6-N)
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
On February 19, 1998 in the House:
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Claims
On February 18, 1998 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 16, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Reading of amendments waived
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Printed as engrossed 988534633-E
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to House
On February 13, 1998 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (37-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance with amendments (16-Y 0-N)
On January 20, 1998 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Finance sub-committee: Revenue Resources
On January 14, 1998 in the Senate:
- Presented & ordered printed 988534633
- Referred to Committee on Finance
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (8)
March 12, 1998: VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT R (39-Y 0-N)
March 11, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE (76-Y 24-N)
March 5, 1998: Reported from Appropriations with amd. (25-Y 0-N)
February 25, 1998: Reported from Claims with amendment (10-Y 6-N)
February 16, 1998: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
February 16, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
February 13, 1998: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (37-Y 0-N)
February 12, 1998: Reported from Finance with amendments (16-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor