+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (27)
On March 27, 2009 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0255)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 255 (effective 7/1/09)
On March 6, 2009 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 5, 2009 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 4, 2009 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB889ER)
- Enrolled
On February 25, 2009 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 24, 2009 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 23, 2009 in the House:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (22-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 2009 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
On February 5, 2009 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 2009 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB889S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 090922272-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read second time
On February 3, 2009 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 2, 2009 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 090922272-S1
- Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (10-Y 0-N)
On January 27, 2009 in the Senate:
- Assigned Courts sub: Criminal
On January 15, 2009 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Courts of Justice
- Rereferred from Transportation (15-Y 0-N)
On December 31, 2008 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/09 090412272
+ − Votes (6)
February 25, 2009: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 23, 2009: Reported from Courts of Justice (22-Y 0-N)
February 5, 2009: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
February 3, 2009: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 2, 2009: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (10-Y 0-N)
January 15, 2009: Rereferred from Transportation (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor