+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (27)
On March 14, 2007 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0145)
On March 9, 2007 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 145 (effective 7/1/07)
On February 20, 2007 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 20, 2007 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB884ER)
- Enrolled
On February 13, 2007 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (92-Y 5-N)
- Passed House (92-Y 5-N)
- Read third time
On February 12, 2007 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 9, 2007 in the House:
- Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety (20-Y 0-N)
On February 2, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety
On January 18, 2007 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On January 17, 2007 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB884S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 077791724-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read second time
On January 16, 2007 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On January 15, 2007 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (13-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 077791724-S1
On January 8, 2007 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/07 072513724
+ − Votes (5)
February 13, 2007: VOTE: PASSAGE (92-Y 5-N)
February 9, 2007: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety (20-Y 0-N)
January 18, 2007: VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
January 16, 2007: VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
January 15, 2007: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (13-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor