+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (31)
On March 24, 1997 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0637)
On March 21, 1997 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 637 (effective 7/1/97)
On March 6, 1997 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 5, 1997 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 4, 1997 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On February 25, 1997 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB883ER)
On February 17, 1997 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT (40-Y 0-N)
- House amendment agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Reading of amendment waived
On February 13, 1997 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (82-Y 15-N)
- Passed House with amendment (82-Y 15-N)
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read third time
On February 12, 1997 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 11, 1997 in the House:
- Reported from Tra. w/amd. (16-Y 6-N)
On February 6, 1997 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Read first time
On February 5, 1997 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 4, 1997 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: PASSAGE (22-Y 18-N)
- Passed Senate (22-Y 18-N)
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 3, 1997 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On January 31, 1997 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On January 30, 1997 in the Senate:
- Reported from Transportation (5-Y 4-N 6-A)
On January 15, 1997 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Presented & ordered printed 970755713
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (7)
February 17, 1997: VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT (40-Y 0-N)
February 13, 1997: VOTE: PASSAGE (82-Y 15-N)
February 11, 1997: Reported from Tra. w/amd. (16-Y 6-N)
February 4, 1997: VOTE: PASSAGE (22-Y 18-N)
February 4, 1997: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
January 31, 1997: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
January 30, 1997: Reported from Transportation (5-Y 4-N 6-A)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor