+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (32)
On March 26, 2003 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0567)
On March 24, 2003 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 567 (effective 7/1/03)
On March 6, 2003 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 5, 2003 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 5, 2003 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On February 28, 2003 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB881ER)
On February 19, 2003 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT (40-Y 0-N)
- House amendment agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 18, 2003 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On February 14, 2003 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Passed House with amendment BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read third time
On February 13, 2003 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 11, 2003 in the House:
- Reported from C. & L. with amendment (21-Y 0-N)
On January 23, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Read first time
On January 17, 2003 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: RECONSIDER R (39-Y 0-N)
- Rec. of passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (38-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
On January 16, 2003 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 15, 2003 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On January 13, 2003 in the Senate:
- Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N)
On January 8, 2003 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/07/03 030296254
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (8)
February 19, 2003: VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT (40-Y 0-N)
February 14, 2003: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 11, 2003: Reported from C. & L. with amendment (21-Y 0-N)
January 17, 2003: VOTE: PASSAGE R (38-Y 0-N)
January 17, 2003: VOTE: RECONSIDER R (39-Y 0-N)
January 17, 2003: VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
January 15, 2003: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
January 13, 2003: Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor