+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (22)
On February 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0020)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 20 (effective 7/1/15)
On February 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Friday, February 27, 2015
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 2/20/15
On February 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 16, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB881ER)
- Enrolled
On February 12, 2015 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 11, 2015 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 10, 2015 in the House:
- Reported from Commerce and Labor (22-Y 0-N)
On January 30, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On January 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On January 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On January 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported from Commerce and Labor (14-Y 0-N)
On January 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15102978D
+ − Votes (5)
February 12, 2015: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 10, 2015: Reported from Commerce and Labor (22-Y 0-N)
January 23, 2015: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
January 21, 2015: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
January 19, 2015: Reported from Commerce and Labor (14-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor