+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (32)
On March 23, 1995 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0417)
On March 20, 1995 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 417 (effective See bill)
On March 7, 1995 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 6, 1995 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
- Enrolled
On February 24, 1995 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB881ER)
On February 20, 1995 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Passed House (Block Vote) (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 17, 1995 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 16, 1995 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 1995 in the House:
- Assigned to General Laws sub-committee: 6
On February 9, 1995 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Read first time
On February 8, 1995 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 6, 1995 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Reading of amendment waived
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Communicated to House
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
- Printed as engrossed LD0052637-E
On February 3, 1995 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 2, 1995 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance with amendment (15-Y 0-N)
On January 30, 1995 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Finance
- Reported from A. C. & N. R. (15-Y 0-N)
On January 20, 1995 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
- Presented & ordered printed LD0052637
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (7)
February 20, 1995: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 16, 1995: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N)
February 6, 1995: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
February 6, 1995: VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
February 3, 1995: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
February 2, 1995: Reported from Finance with amendment (15-Y 0-N)
January 30, 1995: Reported from A. C. & N. R. (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (37)
Type:
Primary Sponsor