+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (34)
On March 13, 1995 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0140)
On March 9, 1995 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 140 (effective 4/1/95)
On February 25, 1995 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 25, 1995 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 24, 1995 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On February 21, 1995 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB877ER)
On February 15, 1995 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT (40-Y 0-N)
- House amendment agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Reading of amendment waived
On February 13, 1995 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE EMERGENCY (99-Y 0-N)
- Passed House with amendment (99-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read third time
On February 10, 1995 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 9, 1995 in the House:
- Reported from C. I. B. w/amd. (21-Y 0-N)
On February 3, 1995 in the House:
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Corporations, Insurance and Banking
On February 2, 1995 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 1, 1995 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (38-Y 0-N)
- Read second time and engrossed
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
- Rec. of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: RECONSIDER (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to House
On January 31, 1995 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On January 30, 1995 in the Senate:
- Reported from Commerce and Labor (11-Y 0-N)
On January 20, 1995 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Presented & ordered printed w/emg clause LD3391845
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (9)
February 15, 1995: VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT (40-Y 0-N)
February 13, 1995: VOTE: PASSAGE EMERGENCY (99-Y 0-N)
February 9, 1995: Reported from C. I. B. w/amd. (21-Y 0-N)
February 1, 1995: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
February 1, 1995: VOTE: PASSAGE (38-Y 0-N)
February 1, 1995: VOTE: RECONSIDER (40-Y 0-N)
February 1, 1995: VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
January 31, 1995: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
January 30, 1995: Reported from Commerce and Labor (11-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (24)
Type:
Primary Sponsor