+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (34)
On April 12, 2007 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0944)
On April 10, 2007 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 944 (effective 7/1/07)
On April 4, 2007 in the Senate:
- Communicated to Governor
- Senate rejected Governor's recommendation (11-Y 28-N)
- Reconsideration of Governor's recommendation agreed to (40-Y 0-N)
- Senate rejected Governor's recommendation (11-Y 27-N)
On April 3, 2007 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar
On March 26, 2007 in the Senate:
- Governor's recommendation received by Senate
On March 8, 2007 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 7, 2007 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 7, 2007 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB874ER)
- Enrolled
On February 21, 2007 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (87-Y 8-N)
- Passed House (87-Y 8-N)
- Read third time
On February 20, 2007 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 19, 2007 in the House:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (18-Y 2-N)
On February 6, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: Criminal Law
On February 2, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On January 18, 2007 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On January 17, 2007 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB874S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 077794766-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read second time
On January 16, 2007 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On January 15, 2007 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (11-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 077794766-S1
On January 8, 2007 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/07 073117766
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (8)
April 4, 2007: Senate rejected Governor's recommendation (11-Y 27-N)
April 4, 2007: Senate rejected Governor's recommendation (11-Y 28-N)
February 21, 2007: VOTE: PASSAGE (87-Y 8-N)
February 19, 2007: Reported from Courts of Justice (18-Y 2-N)
January 18, 2007: VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
January 16, 2007: VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
January 15, 2007: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (11-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor