+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (18)
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
On February 26, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2019 by voice vote
On February 19, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 3-N)
On February 16, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned ACNR sub: Subcommittee #1
On February 14, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
On February 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (33-Y 7-N)
On February 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 18106458D-S1
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB872S1
On February 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (9-Y 5-N)
- Committee substitute printed 18106458D-S1
- Substitute bill reprinted 18106458D-S1
On January 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Presented and ordered printed 18104860D
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
+ − Votes (4)
February 19, 2018: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 3-N)
February 7, 2018: Read third time and passed Senate (33-Y 7-N)
February 5, 2018: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (20)
Type:
Primary Sponsor