+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (34)
On March 27, 1995 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0485)
On March 21, 1995 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 485 (effective 7/1/95)
On March 16, 1995 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 14, 1995 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
- Enrolled
On March 9, 1995 in the Senate:
- Substitute bill reprinted LD6349722-S1
On March 7, 1995 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB872ER)
On February 23, 1995 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Passed House (Block Vote) (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 22, 1995 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 21, 1995 in the House:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (22-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 1995 in the House:
- Assigned to C. J. sub-committee: 1
On February 9, 1995 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Read first time
On February 8, 1995 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 6, 1995 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Engrossed by Senate - comm. sub. LD6349722-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to LD6349722-S1
- VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to House
On February 3, 1995 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed LD6349722-S1
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 2, 1995 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N)
On February 1, 1995 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Finance
- Reported from Courts of Justice w/sub. (13-Y 0-N)
On January 24, 1995 in the Senate:
- Assigned to C. J. sub-committee: Criminal Law & Procedure
On January 20, 1995 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Presented & ordered printed LD7610722
+ − Votes (7)
February 23, 1995: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 21, 1995: Reported from Courts of Justice (22-Y 0-N)
February 6, 1995: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
February 6, 1995: VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
February 3, 1995: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
February 2, 1995: Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N)
February 1, 1995: Reported from Courts of Justice w/sub. (13-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor