+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (28)
On April 20, 2000 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0561)
On April 7, 2000 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 561 (effective 7/1/00)
On March 15, 2000 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 14, 2000 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 14, 2000 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On March 9, 2000 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB87ER)
On February 28, 2000 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
- Passed House (Block Vote) (97-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 25, 2000 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 23, 2000 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws (25-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 2000 in the House:
- Assigned to General Laws sub-committee: 1
On February 1, 2000 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
On January 24, 2000 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (38-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
On January 21, 2000 in the Senate:
- Printed as engrossed 003519420-E
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read second time
On January 20, 2000 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On January 19, 2000 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws with amd (15-Y 0-N)
On January 12, 2000 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Presented & ordered printed 003519420
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
February 28, 2000: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
February 23, 2000: Reported from General Laws (25-Y 0-N)
January 24, 2000: VOTE: PASSAGE R (38-Y 0-N)
January 20, 2000: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
January 19, 2000: Reported from General Laws with amd (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor