+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (41)
On April 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 95 (effective 7/1/22 - see bill)
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0095)
On March 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 22, 2022
On March 10, 2022 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB87ER)
- Enrolled
On March 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Title replaced 22107366D-H1
- House substitute agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On March 7, 2022 in the House:
- Committee substitute agreed to 22107366D-H1
- Read third time
- VOTE: Passage (98-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB87H1
- Passed House with substitute (98-Y 0-N)
On March 4, 2022 in the House:
- Read second time
On March 2, 2022 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 22107366D-H1
- Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
On February 23, 2022 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N)
On February 21, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
- Read first time
- Assigned ACNR sub: Agriculture
On February 14, 2022 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- Printed as engrossed 22106321D-ES1
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB87ES1
- Read second time
On February 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 22106321D-S1
- Reading of amendment waived
- Amendment by Senator Stanley agreed to
- Passed by for the day
On February 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On February 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 22106321D-S1
- Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (9-Y 0-N)
On February 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Assigned ACNR sub: Companion Animals
On January 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22101357D