+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (28)
On March 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0264)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 264 (effective 7/1/17)
On March 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 11, 2016
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 3/4/16
On March 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 29, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB87ER)
- Enrolled
On February 26, 2016 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 25, 2016 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 24, 2016 in the House:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (22-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 2016 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 2016 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: Civil Law
On February 8, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB87S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 16104455D-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read second time
On February 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 16104455D-S1
- Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
On December 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16100681D
+ − Votes (6)
February 26, 2016: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
February 24, 2016: Reported from Courts of Justice (22-Y 0-N)
February 17, 2016: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N)
February 4, 2016: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 2, 2016: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 1, 2016: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor