+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Left in Appropriations
On February 8, 2018 in the House:
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
On February 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (21-Y 19-N)
- Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (22-Y 18-N)
On February 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On February 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read second time
- Printed as engrossed 18104469D-E
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate as amended SB869E
On January 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On January 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance with amendment (11-Y 4-N)
On January 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Presented and ordered printed 18104469D
+ − Votes (5)
February 5, 2018: Read third time and passed Senate (22-Y 18-N)
February 5, 2018: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 5, 2018: Passed Senate (21-Y 19-N)
January 31, 2018: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
January 30, 2018: Reported from Finance with amendment (11-Y 4-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor