+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (29)
On March 21, 1995 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0266)
On March 16, 1995 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 266 (effective 7/1/95)
On March 1, 1995 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 28, 1995 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 27, 1995 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On February 22, 1995 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB868ER)
On February 15, 1995 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Passed House (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 14, 1995 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 13, 1995 in the House:
- Reported from Labor and Commerce (22-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 1995 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Read first time
On February 8, 1995 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 7, 1995 in the Senate:
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- Read second time
- Reading of amendment waived
- Communicated to House
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Printed as engrossed LD1626681-E
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 1995 in the Senate:
- Reported from C. & L. with amendment (13-Y 0-N)
On January 20, 1995 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Presented & ordered printed LD1626681
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
February 15, 1995: VOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 13, 1995: Reported from Labor and Commerce (22-Y 0-N)
February 7, 1995: VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
February 7, 1995: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
February 7, 1995: VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
February 6, 1995: Reported from C. & L. with amendment (13-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor