+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On March 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 109 (effective 7/1/18)
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0109)
On February 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 26, 2018
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 5, 2018
On February 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 22, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB868ER)
On February 20, 2018 in the House:
- Read third time
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
On February 19, 2018 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 15, 2018 in the House:
- Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
On February 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On February 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
On January 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Assigned Education sub: Health
On January 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Presented and ordered printed 18104424D
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
+ − Votes (5)
February 20, 2018: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 15, 2018: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N)
February 6, 2018: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 2, 2018: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
February 1, 2018: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor