+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (31)
On March 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 198 (effective - see bill)
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0198)
On February 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 26, 2018
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 5, 2018
On February 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 22, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB867ER)
On February 20, 2018 in the House:
- Read third time
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
On February 19, 2018 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 15, 2018 in the House:
- Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
On February 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 18106388D-S1
- Reading of amendment waived
- Committee amendment rejected
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB867S1
On February 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance with amendment (16-Y 0-N)
On February 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 18106388D-S1
- Rereferred to Finance
On January 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Assigned Education sub: Health
On January 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Presented and ordered printed 18104425D
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health