+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (30)
On March 31, 1995 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0610)
On March 25, 1995 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 610 (effective 7/1/95)
On March 10, 1995 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 8, 1995 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 7, 1995 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On March 1, 1995 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB866ER)
On February 21, 1995 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Passed House (Block Vote) (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 20, 1995 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 17, 1995 in the House:
- Reported from Agriculture (16-Y 0-N)
On February 15, 1995 in the House:
- Assigned to Agriculture sub-committee: 1
On February 3, 1995 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
- Read first time
On February 2, 1995 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 1, 1995 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
- Read second time and engrossed
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: PASSAGE (38-Y 0-N)
- Rec. of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: RECONSIDER (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
On January 31, 1995 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On January 30, 1995 in the Senate:
- Reported from A. C. & N. R. (14-Y 0-N)
On January 20, 1995 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
- Presented & ordered printed LD6070721
+ − Votes (8)
February 21, 1995: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 17, 1995: Reported from Agriculture (16-Y 0-N)
February 1, 1995: VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
February 1, 1995: VOTE: PASSAGE (38-Y 0-N)
February 1, 1995: VOTE: RECONSIDER (40-Y 0-N)
February 1, 1995: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
January 31, 1995: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
January 30, 1995: Reported from A. C. & N. R. (14-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor