+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (24)
On February 15, 2007 in the House:
- Tabled in Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote
On February 6, 2007 in the House:
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
On February 2, 2007 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: (32-Y 7-N)
- Passed Senate (32-Y 7-N)
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (35-Y 5-N)
- Passed Senate (35-Y 5-N)
- Read third time
On February 1, 2007 in the Senate:
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read second time
- Printed as engrossed 077616768-E
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate as amended SB865E
On January 31, 2007 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On January 30, 2007 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance with amendment (15-Y 0-N)
On January 26, 2007 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Finance
- Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (10-Y 4-N)
On January 8, 2007 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/07 077616768
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
February 2, 2007: VOTE: (35-Y 5-N)
February 2, 2007: VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
February 2, 2007: VOTE: (32-Y 7-N)
January 31, 2007: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
January 30, 2007: Reported from Finance with amendment (15-Y 0-N)
January 26, 2007: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (10-Y 4-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor