+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On March 21, 1997 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0561)
On March 20, 1997 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 561 (effective 7/1/97)
On March 5, 1997 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 4, 1997 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 3, 1997 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On February 25, 1997 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB865ER)
On February 18, 1997 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Passed House (Block Vote) (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 17, 1997 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 14, 1997 in the House:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (22-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 1997 in the House:
- Assigned to C. J. sub-committee: 2
On February 6, 1997 in the House:
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
On February 5, 1997 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 4, 1997 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: PASSAGE (36-Y 3-N)
- Passed Senate (36-Y 3-N)
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 3, 1997 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 2, 1997 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (12-Y 3-N)
On January 14, 1997 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Presented & ordered printed 972363833
+ − Votes (6)
February 18, 1997: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 14, 1997: Reported from Courts of Justice (22-Y 0-N)
February 4, 1997: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
February 4, 1997: VOTE: PASSAGE (36-Y 3-N)
February 3, 1997: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
February 2, 1997: Reported from Courts of Justice (12-Y 3-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor