+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (46)
On March 19, 2003 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0067)
On March 16, 2003 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 67 (effective 7/1/03)
On March 6, 2003 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 5, 2003 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 5, 2003 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On February 26, 2003 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB864ER)
On February 20, 2003 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT (38-Y 0-N)
- House amendments agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N)
On February 19, 2003 in the House:
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read third time
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Passed House with amendments BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
On February 18, 2003 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 17, 2003 in the House:
- Reported from C. J. with amendments (21-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 2003 in the House:
- Assigned to C. J. sub-committee: 1
On February 5, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 4, 2003 in the Senate:
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read second time
- Amendment by Sen. Edwards withdrawn
- Amendment by Sen. Saslaw withdrawn
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute rejected (Courts #1)030649536-S1
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute agreed to (Courts #2)031842528-S2
- Engrossed by Senate - committee sub. 031842528-S2
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to House
On February 3, 2003 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
- Committee substitute printed 031842528-S2
On February 2, 2003 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice w/sub (15-Y 0-N)
On January 30, 2003 in the Senate:
- Motion to recommit to committee agreed to
- Recommitted to Courts of Justice
On January 29, 2003 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On January 28, 2003 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On January 27, 2003 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On January 24, 2003 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (38-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On January 23, 2003 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 030649536-S1
On January 22, 2003 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice w/sub (15-Y 0-N)
On January 8, 2003 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/07/03 033833528
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (8)
February 20, 2003: VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT (38-Y 0-N)
February 19, 2003: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 17, 2003: Reported from C. J. with amendments (21-Y 0-N)
February 4, 2003: VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
February 4, 2003: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
February 2, 2003: Reported from Courts of Justice w/sub (15-Y 0-N)
January 24, 2003: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (38-Y 0-N)
January 22, 2003: Reported from Courts of Justice w/sub (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor