+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On February 16, 1995 in the House:
- Passed by indefinitely in App. (21-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 1995 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Read first time
On February 8, 1995 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 6, 1995 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 3, 1995 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 2, 1995 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N)
On January 20, 1995 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Presented & ordered printed LD3647699
+ − Votes (5)
February 16, 1995: Passed by indefinitely in App. (21-Y 0-N)
February 6, 1995: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
February 6, 1995: VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
February 3, 1995: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
February 2, 1995: Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor