+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (44)
On March 20, 2001 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0308)
On March 19, 2001 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 308 (effective 7/1/01)
On March 2, 2001 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 2, 2001 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 2, 2001 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On February 26, 2001 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB863ER)
On February 22, 2001 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT (39-Y 1-N)
- House substitute agreed to by Senate (39-Y 1-N)
On February 21, 2001 in the House:
- Read third time
- Committee substitute agreed to 010251508-H1
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute 010251508-H1
- Passed House with substitute (88-Y 11-N 1-A)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (88-Y 11-N 1-A)
- Rec. of House passage agreed to by House
- VOTE: PASSAGE #2 (86-Y 10-N 4-A)
- Passed House with substitute (86-Y 10-N 4-A)
On February 20, 2001 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
- Passed by temporarily
- Read third time
On February 19, 2001 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
- Passed by temporarily
- Read third time
On February 16, 2001 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 15, 2001 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 010251508-H1
- Reported from C. I. B. w/sub (20-Y 1-N)
On February 7, 2001 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Corporations, Insurance and Banking
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 2, 2001 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: PASSAGE (34-Y 6-N)
- Passed Senate (34-Y 6-N)
- Passed by temporarily
- Read third time
On February 1, 2001 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On January 31, 2001 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute 019258508-S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 019258508-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read second time
On January 30, 2001 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 019258508-S1
On January 29, 2001 in the Senate:
- Reported from C. & L. with substitute (9-Y 4-N 2-A)
On January 10, 2001 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 12/27/00 017106508
+ − Votes (7)
February 22, 2001: VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT (39-Y 1-N)
February 21, 2001: VOTE: PASSAGE (88-Y 11-N 1-A)
February 21, 2001: VOTE: PASSAGE #2 (86-Y 10-N 4-A)
February 15, 2001: Reported from C. I. B. w/sub (20-Y 1-N)
February 2, 2001: VOTE: PASSAGE (34-Y 6-N)
January 30, 2001: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
January 29, 2001: Reported from C. & L. with substitute (9-Y 4-N 2-A)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor