+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On February 28, 2009 in the House:
- Left in General Laws
On February 17, 2009 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends laying on the table
On February 16, 2009 in the House:
- Assigned GL sub: Professions/Occupations/Administrative Process
On February 13, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 9, 2009 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (36-Y 4-N)
On February 6, 2009 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Reading of amendment waived
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate as amended SB861E
- Printed as engrossed 093185228-E
On February 5, 2009 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 2009 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance with amendment (16-Y 0-N)
On January 21, 2009 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Finance
- Reported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N)
On December 29, 2008 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/09 093185228
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
February 17, 2009: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table
February 9, 2009: Read third time and passed Senate (36-Y 4-N)
February 5, 2009: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
February 4, 2009: Reported from Finance with amendment (16-Y 0-N)
January 21, 2009: Reported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor