+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (32)
On April 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0747)
On April 15, 2015 in the House:
- Enacted, Chapter 747 (effective 7/1/15)
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
On April 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by President as reenrolled
- Reenrolled bill text (SB848ER2)
- Reenrolled
- Governor's recommendation adopted
On April 15, 2015 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N)
- House concurred in Governor's recommendation (97-Y 0-N)
On April 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (38-Y 2-N)
On April 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar
On March 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Governor's recommendation received by Senate
On February 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 2/24/15
On February 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB848ER)
On February 20, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 17, 2015 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 16, 2015 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 13, 2015 in the House:
- Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety (21-Y 0-N)
On January 30, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On January 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On January 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On January 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N)
On January 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15100731D
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (7)
April 15, 2015: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (38-Y 2-N)
April 15, 2015: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N)
February 17, 2015: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 13, 2015: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety (21-Y 0-N)
January 23, 2015: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
January 21, 2015: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
January 19, 2015: Reported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor