+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (25)
On February 17, 2003 in the House:
- Incorporated by S.T. (SB1247-Stosch) (20-Y 0-N)
On February 5, 2003 in the House:
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
- Referred to Committee on Science and Technology
On February 4, 2003 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: PASSAGE (39-Y 1-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 1-N)
On February 3, 2003 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute rejected 032129218-S1
- Read second time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Reading of substitute waived
- Floor substitute printed 032135448-S2 (Howell)
- Substitute by Sen. Howell agreed to 032135448-S2
- Engrossed by Senate - floor substitute 032135448-S2
On January 31, 2003 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
- VOTE: RECONSIDER R (40-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of passed by for the day (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed by for the day
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On January 30, 2003 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 032129218-S1
On January 29, 2003 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws with sub (14-Y 0-N 1-A)
On January 14, 2003 in the Senate:
- Assigned to General Laws sub-committee: 6
On January 8, 2003 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/07/03 032818218
+ − Votes (5)
February 17, 2003: Incorporated by S.T. (SB1247-Stosch) (20-Y 0-N)
February 4, 2003: VOTE: PASSAGE (39-Y 1-N)
January 31, 2003: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
January 31, 2003: VOTE: RECONSIDER R (40-Y 0-N)
January 29, 2003: Reported from General Laws with sub (14-Y 0-N 1-A)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor