+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On February 21, 2017 in the House:
- Left in Privileges and Elections
On February 14, 2017 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (5-Y 2-N)
On February 8, 2017 in the House:
- Assigned P & E sub: Elections
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (26-Y 14-N)
On February 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On January 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported from Privileges and Elections (12-Y 2-N)
On November 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17101054D
+ − Votes (4)
February 14, 2017: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (5-Y 2-N)
February 6, 2017: Read third time and passed Senate (26-Y 14-N)
February 2, 2017: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
January 31, 2017: Reported from Privileges and Elections (12-Y 2-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor