+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (25)
On March 29, 1999 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0265)
On March 21, 1999 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 265 (effective 7/1/99)
On March 9, 1999 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 8, 1999 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 8, 1999 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On March 3, 1999 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB846ER)
On February 23, 1999 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N)
- Passed House (96-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 22, 1999 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 19, 1999 in the House:
- Reported from Count., Cities and Towns (20-Y 2-N)
On February 4, 1999 in the House:
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
On February 3, 1999 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 1, 1999 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On January 29, 1999 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 28, 1999 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
- Read second time
On January 27, 1999 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On January 26, 1999 in the Senate:
- Reported from Local Government (14-Y 0-N)
On January 13, 1999 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Local Government
- Presented & ordered printed 996522657
+ − Votes (5)
February 23, 1999: VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N)
February 19, 1999: Reported from Count., Cities and Towns (20-Y 2-N)
February 1, 1999: VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
January 27, 1999: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
January 26, 1999: Reported from Local Government (14-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor