+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (39)
On March 25, 2011 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0597)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 597 (effective 7/1/11)
On March 6, 2011 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 3, 2011 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 3, 2011 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB844ER)
- Enrolled
On February 25, 2011 in the Senate:
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 25, 2011 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
- Conference report agreed to by House (98-Y 0-N)
On February 25, 2011 in the Senate:
- Conference substitute printed 11105642D-S1
On February 24, 2011 in the House:
- Conferees appointed by House
- Delegates: Cline, Peace, Keam
On February 23, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senators: Reynolds, Petersen, Miller, Y.B.
- Conferees appointed by Senate
- Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N)
On February 21, 2011 in the House:
- House requested conference committee
- House insisted on substitute
On February 18, 2011 in the Senate:
- House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 39-N)
On February 16, 2011 in the House:
- Committee substitute agreed to 11105278D-H1
- Read third time
- Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB844H1
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
On February 15, 2011 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 14, 2011 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 11105278D-H1
- Reported from Finance with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 2011 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (10-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 2011 in the House:
- Assigned Finance sub: #2
On February 7, 2011 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Finance
On January 21, 2011 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (35-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (35-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (35-Y 0-N)
On January 20, 2011 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 19, 2011 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On January 18, 2011 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (13-Y 0-N)
On January 7, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11103225D
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (12)
February 25, 2011: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
February 25, 2011: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 23, 2011: Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N)
February 18, 2011: House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 39-N)
February 16, 2011: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
February 14, 2011: Reported from Finance with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
February 9, 2011: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (10-Y 0-N)
January 21, 2011: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (35-Y 0-N)
January 21, 2011: Passed Senate (35-Y 0-N)
January 21, 2011: Read third time and passed Senate (35-Y 0-N)
January 19, 2011: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
January 18, 2011: Reported from Finance (13-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor