+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (29)
On March 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0526)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 526 (effective 7/1/13)
On February 23, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB841ER)
- Enrolled
On February 20, 2013 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (49-Y 48-N)
- Passed House (49-Y 48-N)
- Read third time
On February 19, 2013 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 18, 2013 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 14, 2013 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N)
On February 11, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Read first time
- Assigned GL sub: #1 Housing
On February 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- Bills placed in block (39-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB841S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 13104627D-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read second time
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 13104627D-S1
- Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
On January 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13102321D
+ − Votes (8)
February 20, 2013: VOTE: PASSAGE (49-Y 48-N)
February 14, 2013: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N)
February 13, 2013: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N)
February 5, 2013: Bills placed in block (39-Y 0-N)
February 5, 2013: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 5, 2013: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 5, 2013: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 4, 2013: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor