+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (31)
On March 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 712 (effective 7/1/18)
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0712)
On March 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 14, 2018
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 5, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB840ER)
On February 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed by temporarily
- House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Title replaced 18107298D-H1
On February 26, 2018 in the House:
- Read third time
- Committee substitute agreed to 18107298D-H1
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB840H1
- Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
On February 23, 2018 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 21, 2018 in the House:
- Reported from Education with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 18107298D-H1
On February 19, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned Education sub: Subcommittee #1
On February 8, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Education
On February 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On February 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N)
On January 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Assigned Education sub: Public Education
On January 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Presented and ordered printed 18104058D
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
+ − Votes (7)
February 28, 2018: House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 26, 2018: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
February 21, 2018: Reported from Education with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
February 19, 2018: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N)
February 6, 2018: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 2, 2018: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
February 1, 2018: Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor