+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On March 27, 2001 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0702)
On March 26, 2001 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 702 (effective 7/1/01)
On February 26, 2001 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 26, 2001 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 23, 2001 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On February 22, 2001 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB840ER)
On February 16, 2001 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 15, 2001 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 13, 2001 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations (28-Y 0-N)
On February 2, 2001 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Read first time
On January 26, 2001 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On January 25, 2001 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 24, 2001 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (38-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On January 23, 2001 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (13-Y 0-N)
On January 10, 2001 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 12/20/00 013135260
+ − Votes (5)
February 16, 2001: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 13, 2001: Reported from Appropriations (28-Y 0-N)
January 26, 2001: VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
January 24, 2001: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (38-Y 0-N)
January 23, 2001: Reported from Finance (13-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor