+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On February 18, 2013 in the House:
- Left in Courts of Justice
On February 11, 2013 in the House:
- Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (3-Y 3-N)
On February 8, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: #1 Criminal
On February 6, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 13104826D-S1
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB840S1
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On January 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- Incorporates SB836
On January 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 13104826D-S1
- Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (14-Y 0-N 1-A)
On January 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13101271D