+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (39)
On March 27, 2023 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0716)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 716 (effective 7/1/23)
On March 13, 2023 in the Senate:
- Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 27, 2023
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 13, 2023
On March 8, 2023 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 8, 2023 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 7, 2023 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB839ER)
- Enrolled
On February 23, 2023 in the Senate:
- Title replaced 23106959D-H1
- House substitute agreed to by Senate (39-Y 1-N)
On February 22, 2023 in the House:
- VOTE: Passage (94-Y 4-N)
- Passed House with substitute (94-Y 4-N)
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB839H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 23106959D-H1
- Read third time
On February 21, 2023 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 20, 2023 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 16, 2023 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
- Reported from General Laws with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 23106959D-H1
On February 9, 2023 in the House:
- Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #2
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 2, 2023 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute agreed to 23104915D-S1
- Read second time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB839S1
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 1, 2023 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On January 31, 2023 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N)
On January 18, 2023 in the Senate:
On December 27, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23100939D