+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On February 18, 2013 in the House:
- Left in Appropriations
On February 11, 2013 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned App. sub: Compensation and Retirement
On February 2, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On January 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 1-N)
On January 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Printed as engrossed 13100821D-E
- Engrossed by Senate as amended SB838E
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Reading of amendments waived
- Read second time
On January 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On January 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance with amendments (14-Y 0-N)
On January 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Prefiled and ordered printed with emergency clause; offered 01/09/13 13100821D
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
January 25, 2013: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 1-N)
January 23, 2013: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
January 22, 2013: Reported from Finance with amendments (14-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor