+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On February 18, 2013 in the House:
- Left in Appropriations
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- Referred from Finance by voice vote
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
On February 2, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On January 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
On January 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB831S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 13104173D-S1
On January 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On January 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 13104173D-S1
- Reported from Finance with substitute (14-Y 0-N)
On December 28, 2012 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13101085D
+ − Votes (5)
January 25, 2013: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
January 25, 2013: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
January 25, 2013: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
January 23, 2013: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
January 22, 2013: Reported from Finance with substitute (14-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor