+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (43)
On March 17, 1995 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0185)
On March 14, 1995 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 185 (effective 3/14/95)
On March 1, 1995 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 28, 1995 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 27, 1995 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On February 22, 1995 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB831ER)
On February 14, 1995 in the House:
- Committee substitute agreed to LD5760136-H1
- Reported from Finance with sub. (22-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed LD5760136-H1
- Read second time
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Engrossed by House - com. sub. LD5760136-H1
- Passed House with substitute (100-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE EMERGENCY (100-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 1995 in the Senate:
- Reading of substitute waived
- House substitute agreed to by Senate (35-Y 1-N)
- VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT (35-Y 1-N)
On February 10, 1995 in the House:
- Assigned to Finance sub-committee: 1
On February 7, 1995 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Read first time
On February 6, 1995 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 3, 1995 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute agreed to LD3211673-S1
- Read second time
- Passed by temporarily
- Floor substitute not agreed to (Marye)
- Reading of substitute waived
- Communicated to House
- Engrossed by Senate - comm. sub. LD3211673-S1
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (38-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (39-Y 1-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (39-Y 1-N)
On February 2, 1995 in the Senate:
- Floor substitute printed LD3234701-S2 (Marye)
- Passed by for the day
- VOTE: RECONSIDER (39-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of passed by for the day (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed by for the day
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 1, 1995 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed LD3211673-S1
- Reported from Finance with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
On January 18, 1995 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Presented & ordered printed w/emg clause LD7377673