+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (40)
On March 31, 1999 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0333)
On March 23, 1999 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 333 (effective 7/1/99)
On March 15, 1999 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 12, 1999 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 12, 1999 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On March 4, 1999 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB830ER)
On February 24, 1999 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENTS (40-Y 0-N)
- House amendments agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Reading of amendments waived
On February 22, 1999 in the House:
- Read third time
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Passed House with amendments (Block Vote) (99-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
On February 19, 1999 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 18, 1999 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws with amds. (26-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 1999 in the House:
- Assigned to General Laws sub-committee: 1
On February 4, 1999 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Read first time
On February 3, 1999 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 1, 1999 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
On January 29, 1999 in the Senate:
- Printed as engrossed 994741724-ES1
- Engrossed by Senate - comm. sub.w/amd. 994741724-ES1
- Amendment by Sen. Potts agreed to
- Reading of amendment waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 994741724-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read second time
On January 28, 1999 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Passed by for the day
On January 27, 1999 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On January 26, 1999 in the Senate:
- Reported from Local Government (14-Y 0-N)
On January 21, 1999 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 994741724-S1
On January 20, 1999 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Local Government
- Reported from General Laws with sub. (15-Y 0-N)
On January 13, 1999 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Presented & ordered printed 995085310
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (7)
February 24, 1999: VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENTS (40-Y 0-N)
February 22, 1999: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 18, 1999: Reported from General Laws with amds. (26-Y 0-N)
February 1, 1999: VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
January 27, 1999: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
January 26, 1999: Reported from Local Government (14-Y 0-N)
January 20, 1999: Reported from General Laws with sub. (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor