+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (31)
On April 7, 2020 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0811)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 811 (effective 7/1/20)
On March 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020
On March 5, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB828ER)
- Enrolled
On February 27, 2020 in the House:
- VOTE: Passage (49-Y 46-N)
- Passed House (49-Y 46-N)
- Read third time
On February 26, 2020 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 25, 2020 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 24, 2020 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 20, 2020 in the House:
- Reported from Labor and Commerce (18-Y 4-N)
On February 18, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned L & C sub: Subcommittee #3
On February 13, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Labor and Commerce
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On January 31, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On January 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- Printed as engrossed 20103852D-E
- Engrossed by Senate as amended SB828E
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read second time
On January 29, 2020 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On January 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendment (14-Y 0-N)
On January 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Assigned C&L sub: Energy
On January 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20103852D
+ − Impact Statements (3)
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
February 27, 2020: VOTE: Passage (49-Y 46-N)
February 20, 2020: Reported from Labor and Commerce (18-Y 4-N)
February 18, 2020: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N)
January 31, 2020: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
January 29, 2020: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
January 27, 2020: Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendment (14-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Lynwood W. Lewis, Jr.
Type:
Primary Sponsor