+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (26)
On March 27, 2009 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0583)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 583 (effective 7/1/09)
On February 26, 2009 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 25, 2009 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 25, 2009 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB827ER)
- Enrolled
On February 20, 2009 in the House:
- VOTE: --- PASSAGE (88-Y 11-N)
- Passed House (88-Y 11-N)
- Read third time
On February 19, 2009 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 18, 2009 in the House:
- Reported from Education (18-Y 2-N)
On February 13, 2009 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Education
On February 9, 2009 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- Printed as engrossed 093377326-E
- Engrossed by Senate as amended SB827E
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read second time
On February 6, 2009 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 5, 2009 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health with amendment (15-Y 0-N)
On January 15, 2009 in the Senate:
- Assigned Education sub: Public Education
On December 15, 2008 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/09 093377326